HI SB76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the board of education prioritize for the superintendent of education position candidates that have minimum of ten years of employment in the department of education, with at least five of those years serving in the capacity as a teacher, principal, or higher. Establishes a working understanding of the State's tri-level systems of educational administration as a desired qualification for candidates for the superintendent of education position. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Kapela, Perruso, Okimoto. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 446). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1814), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, Sayama, Tam, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2021-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 70) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-21. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-17-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDU. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDU. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU will hold a public decision making on 02-10-21 3:02PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB76 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).