HI SB758 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the method of service of process for all civil cases under chapter 634, Hawaii Revised Statutes, when personal service is unsuccessful, shall include publication in a newspaper of general circulation three times or publication on the website of the department of the attorney general together with publication in a newspaper of general circulation at least once. Defines general circulation. Effective July 1, 2020. (SD2)
Title
Civil Actions; Service of Process; Service by Publication; Newspaper; Website
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 198) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-19-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |