HI SB758 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 190, on 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 190, on 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the use of Hawaii compliance express for small-business vendors for all contracts and procurements of $2,500 or more. (CD1)
Title
Procurement; Compliance; Small Business
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | (H) Act 190, on 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). | |
2011-07-07 | (S) Act 190, 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Awana, Evans, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 466). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Pine. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Solomon. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-28-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |