HI SB757 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 204, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Education to operate and implement the Future Farmers of America program. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; Future Farmers of America Program; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-02SenateAct 204, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
2013-07-02HouseAct 204, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami excused (1).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda.
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 224.
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); English, Tokuda.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Brower, Cheape.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 549).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Johanson, Jordan, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Fukumoto, Ichiyama, Ito, Takayama, Tsuji, Yamashita voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-09HouseFloor amendment failed following voice vote: Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Wooley). Excused, 0 (none).
2013-04-09HouseFloor Amendment No.15 offered by Rep. Har.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-04-01HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:30PM in conference room 308.
2013-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
2013-03-20HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-11SenateReported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to AGL, WAM.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback