HI SB755 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Human Services to negotiate reimbursement rate for case managers providing services to Medicaid patients. Specifies the percentage by which these reimbursement rates are to be increased.
Title
Relating To Case Managers.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL deferred the measure until 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB692 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB755 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB755 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=755&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB755_.HTM |