HI SB754 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB754
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the threshold blood alcohol concentration for the offense of operating a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Relating To Operating A Vehicle While Intoxicated.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Kidani, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB754 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.