HI SB754 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides cancellation rights to persons who contract to buy a short-term product in Hawaii. Allows disbursement of purchasers' funds to a developer; provided that the developer first posts a bond or letter of credit. (SB754 HD2)
Title
Time Sharing; Time Share; Short-term Product; Right to Cancel; Purchasers; Developers; Bond; Letter of Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 9:30AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 9:35AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 654). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Baker Co-Chair; English, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 538). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Creagan, Keohokalole, Pouha, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-08-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-06-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 195) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Nishihara, Slom. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-04-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TSI, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB271 (Same As) 2015-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).