HI SB751 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - (S) The committee(s) on EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-11 2:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - (S) The committee(s) on EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-11 2:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the name of the works of art special fund to an arts, culture, and heritage special fund; expands the uses of the fund to include site modifications, display, interpretive work, and specific renovations and repairs for the Bernice Pauahi Bishop Museum, Iolani Palace, and Washington Place for the period from July 1, 2011, to June 30, 2015; requires report and long-range plan.
Title
Works of Art Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=751 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB751_.HTM |