HI SB750 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Anaergia Incorporated with the development of facilities for renewable nonfossil fuel energy production in Maui.
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Renewable Energy; Anaergia Incorporated ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=750&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB750_.HTM |