HI SB748 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB748
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the construction and operation of non-chemical sunscreen dispensers on all state beaches to alleviate the damaging effects of chemical-based sunscreen on reef ecosystems. Allows the Department of Land and Natural Resources to contract with private parties to assist with the maintenance and management of sunscreen dispensers at all state beaches.
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB748 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Non-Chemical Sunscreen Dispensers
State Beaches
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Non-Chemical Sunscreen Dispensers
State Beaches