HI SB744 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB744
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the authorization for the governor to negotiate with any person for the development or expansion of private in-state correctional facilities. Prohibits the establishment of private correctional facilities within the State. Allows the governor to enter into a contract with a private entity to construct correctional facilities on public or private lands for the benefit of the State if the facilities are operated by the Department of Public Safety. Repeals the authorization of the governor to enter into a contract with a private entity for the lease or purchase of correctional facilities the entity constructs. Effective 5/6/2137. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Correctional Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:20PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).