HI SB719 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on EGH/HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-13 3:00PM in conference room 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on EGH/HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-13 3:00PM in conference room 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the HHFDC and HCDA to develop programs to issue development credits to projects that incorporate urban gardening programs. Requires HHFDC and HCDA to report to the legislature.
Title
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation; Hawaii Community Development Authority; Development Credits; Urban Gardening
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH/HRE, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB560 (Same As) 2013-07-02 - Act 202, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=719&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB719_.HTM |