HI SB715 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of September as Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder Awareness Month to promote public awareness of the risks of alcohol consumption during pregnancy.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |