HI SB712 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB712

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that the Executive Director of the Aha Moku Advisory Committee shall be subject to the advice and consent of the Senate, with a term limit of four years. Effective 1/1/25. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Aha Moku Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2021-02-02SenateRe-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HWN/WTL, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB780 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB712 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback