HI SB711 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB711
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all letterheads, documents, symbols, and emblems of the State and other political subdivisions that include Hawaiian words or names to include accurate and appropriate Hawaiian names, spelling, and punctuation. Establishes references for accurate, appropriate, and authentic Hawaiian names and words, including proper Hawaiian spelling and punctuation. Clarifies that the full text of bills and other official documents are not required to be written in Hawaiian and that misspelled or incorrectly punctuated Hawaiian words and names shall not invalidate the documents or render them unenforceable and no cause of action shall arise accordingly.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Language.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-21 9:31AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB711 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=711&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB711_.HTM |