HI SB706 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and makes an appropriation for the development of an electrolysis process hydrogen production, storage, and dispensing facility and appropriates funds for the operation of the facility. (SD1)
Title
High Technology Development Corporation; High Technology Special Fund; Electrolysis Process Hydrogen Production, Storage, and Dispensing Facility; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from ENE/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Harimoto. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE/EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |