HI SB706 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the PLDC to initiate a pilot project after the adoption of rules. Prohibits the PLDC from planning, developing or implementing any projects other than the pilot project until the pilot project has been completed. Requires the PLDC to include a report on the status of the pilot project in its annual report and requires the PLDC to provide a report to the governor and legislature evaluating the pilot project upon its completion. Repeals on 1/1/16.
Title
Public Land Development Corporation; Pilot Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB593 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=706&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB706_.HTM |