HI SB703 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts contracts for the extraction and capture of methane generated from municipal waste from the procurement code. (SB703 HD1)
Title
Solid Waste; Methane Gas
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:30PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ing, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Espero, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, Ihara. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 533). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Rhoads, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pouha; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, Pouha, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Inouye, Kahele, Kidani, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-15 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from ENE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |