HI SB7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation the right of first refusal for the development of property for all development on state lands, excluding Hawaii public housing authority, department of Hawaiian home lands, and department of land and natural resources lands and properties, that are within a one-half mile radius of a rail transit station. Triggers the right of first refusal upon a transfer of any property interest, including a leasehold interest, of state lands that are within a one-half mile radius of a rail transit station. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1101) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 138) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 856) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB7 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).