HI SB698 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 022, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 022, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that state agencies may purchase roadway materials with a minimum recycled glass content. Allows use of minimum glass of ten per cent crushed glass aggregate in all basecourse and subbase. (SB698 HD1)
Title
Roadway Materials; Recycled Glass Content Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (S) Act 022, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Act 022, on 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 642). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) One Day Notice 04-18-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 456). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, Thielen. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Monday, 03-21-11 11:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Re-Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM/TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |