HI SB692 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB692

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Initiates reporting requirements and safeguards to prevent anti-competitive practices in the meat processing industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Food Security.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:45PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, CPN.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1206 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB692 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback