HI SB686 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes the personal use, possession, and sale of cannabis in a specified quantity. Authorizes medical cannabis dispensaries to sell non-medical cannabis for personal use beginning February 1, 2021. Subjects transactions for non-medical cannabis to excise taxes and income taxes. Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
2019-02-11SenateRe-Referred to JDC, CPH/WAM.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-07-19 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback