HI SB686 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of marijuana that constitutes an adequate supply by allowing a qualifying patient to possess 10 marijuana plants and 5 ounces of marijuana at any given time. Keeps confidential the site where marijuana is grown. Prohibits the DOH from requiring that a certifying physician be the patient's primary care physician. Prohibits certifying physicians from naming or describing a patient's particular debilitating condition. Increases the permissible ratio of patients to caregivers by allowing a caregiver to be responsible for the care of up to 5 patients at any given time. Allows transfer to another qualified patient and transport of medical marijuana without prosecution. Allows for recognition of visiting qualifying patients. Transfers departmental jurisdiction of the medical marijuana laws from PSD to DOH and requires PSD to assist with the transfer. Effective 07/01/2013.
Title
Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=686&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB686_.HTM |