HI SB683 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to advance the State's goal of providing a public education for the children of Hawaii by authorizing the legislature to establish, as provided by law, a surcharge on residential investment property and visitor accommodations. (SB683 HD1)
Title
Proposing Amendments To Articles Vii And X Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Authorize The Legislature To Establish A Surcharge On Residential Investment Property And Visitor Accommodations To Increase Funding For Public Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 679). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Tokuda, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, K. Kahele. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1367) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Hashem, Ing, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Wakai. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 179) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB683 (Carry Over) 2017-04-19 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
HB182 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB182 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Constitutional Amendment (ConAm)
Public Education
Residential Investment Property Surcharge
Visitor Accommodation Surcharge
Public Education
Residential Investment Property Surcharge
Visitor Accommodation Surcharge