HI SB677 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB677
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and establishes procedures and criteria for prescriptive authority for clinical psychologists who meet specific education, training, and registration requirements. Requires the Board of Psychology to accept applications for prescriptive authority privilege beginning 7/1/2025. Requires the Board of Psychology to report to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2024. Appropriates funds to the Board of Psychology to implement prescriptive authority privilege for certain clinical psychologists. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Prescriptive Authority For Clinical Psychologists.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB677 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.