HI SB677 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB677
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits specified trolleys, pulleys, cables, or running lines designed to attach a dog to two stationary objects in a configuration that endangers the dog, including by depriving the dog of sustenance. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog under the age of six months unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a tow or log chain if the tow or log chain inhibits the free movement of the dog. Prohibits tethering or restraining a dog with a choke collar, pinch collar, or prong collar unless the dog is engaged in an activity supervised by its owner or an agent of its owner. Effective 10/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Animal Cruelty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-13-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2929) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-20 10:01AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB633 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB677 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
SB677 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.