HI SB675 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a nationally certified school psychologist incentive program. Appropriates funds for the incentive program.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
HB54 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HB54 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Nationally Certified School Psychologist Incentive Program
School Psychologists
Department of Education
Nationally Certified School Psychologist Incentive Program
School Psychologists
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=675&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB675_.HTM |