HI SB675 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the grounds under which an employer may take employment action without committing a discriminatory practice. (SB675 HD1)
Title
Relating To Employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 231) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-27-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB809 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB675 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
SB675 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).