HI SB675 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 020, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 020, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals state authorization to allow a private not-for-profit corporation to acquire student loan notes. (SD1)
Title
Student Loan Funds; Secondary Market Services Corp. - Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (S) Act 020, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Act 020, on 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 569). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1483), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Belatti, Mizuno, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Hanohano, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from EDU/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-11 10:15AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU/CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |