HI SB671 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 111, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 111, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes fentanyl testing strips from the definition of drug paraphernalia in the uniform Controlled Substances Act. Defines fentanyl test strip. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Act 111, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). |
2023-06-22 | House | Act 111, on 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 902). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-23. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-23. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 549). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Deferred one day 04-03-23. |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 224) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |