HI SB668 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a 50% tax credit to a maximum of $250,000 for costs involved in projects that provide housing for low-income and very-low-income residents.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB659 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB668 (Carry Over) 2017-01-31 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
SB668 (Carry Over) 2017-01-31 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=668&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB668_.HTM |