HI SB664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB664
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows agencies to enter performance contracts to undertake or implement energy conservation or alternate energy measures for vehicles and vehicle fleets. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Contracting For Public Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB401 (Same As)
SB664 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB664 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Energy Efficiency
Energy Retrofit and Performance Contracting for Public Facilities
Vehicle Fleets
Vehicles
Energy Retrofit and Performance Contracting for Public Facilities
Vehicle Fleets
Vehicles