HI SB651 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes pilot schools that are approved by the Federal Aviation Administration subject to the oversight of the Hawaii Post-secondary Education Authorization Program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Post-secondary Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-14-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE/TRE, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB651 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.