HI SB647 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB647
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows up to one dwelling per quarter-acre in rural districts.
Title
Relating To Rural Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB502 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
SB647 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
SB647 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=647&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB647_.HTM |