HI SB647 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - The committee(s) on ENE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - The committee(s) on ENE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the California environmental protection agency emission standards for low-emission vehicle standards beginning January 1, 2015.
Title
Health; Motor Vehicle Emission Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ENE, TIA. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=647&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB647_.HTM |