HI SB64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to include in its annual report summary information on all power purchase agreements in effect during the fiscal period of the annual report. (SD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Public Utilities Commission; Annual Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE/TEC, CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1405 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Act 260, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1363).