HI SB639 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires board members of condominium associations to disclose significant financial interests prior to taking action that affects both the association and a third-party provider. Prohibits board members from receiving gifts from those types of third party providers. Expands the powers of the real estate commission to enforce violations by board members of disclosure requirements and gift prohibitions.
Title
Relating To Condominium Associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB382 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB639 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
SB639 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=639&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB639_.HTM |