HI SB638 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 2-year moratorium on evictions of residents from Kahana valley state park; authorizes DLNR to negotiate and execute long-term residential leases with qualified persons in state parks; establishes the planning council to create and implement a living park master plan for Kahana valley state park; and allows DHHL to enter into commercial leases for terms in excess of 65 years but not exceeding 99 years, giving the commercial lessee a right of first refusal following a public auction at the termination of the lease; provided that the commercial lessee shall match the highest lease rental bid offered. (SB638 HD1)
Title
Kahana Valley State Park; Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 4:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 10:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 4:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 10:30 AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 3:30 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-09 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-09 2:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 719). | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Fukunaga, Kokubun. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Carroll, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Wooley, Thielen. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 473). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Morita, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Berg, Herkes, Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, Takai, Tokioka excused (9). | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, C. Lee. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 04-03-09 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, referral sheet 43 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 216) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Galuteria, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Fukunaga. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 2:45 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |