HI SB633 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB633
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a water security fund for the purpose of providing matching grants for projects related to water security; establishes eligible grantees and designates what moneys shall be deposited into the fund; imposes new water security fee. Creates a water security advisory group to advise the commission on which water security projects to select for grants. Requires annual report to legislature. Effective on 1/1/18.
Title
Relating To Water Security Financing.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB633 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=633&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB633_.HTM |