HI SB632 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forfeiture of any property used or taken in any violation of laws or rules that results in a petty misdemeanor.
Title
Petty Misdemeanor; Forfeiture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1079 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=632&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB632_.HTM |