HI SB630 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 036, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 036, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that every judgment for child support is enforceable until paid in full. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Child Support Enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Act 036, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2021-06-10 | House | Act 036, on 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 95) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 95). |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Eli, LoPresti, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-21 3:30PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Eli Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 420). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1705), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1341) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB654 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).