HI SB628 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB628
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires department heads to inform the governor of any vacancy in any board or commission. Requires the governor to maintain a listing of all boards and commissions including specified information. Appropriates funds for 1.0 FTE position to manage listing information for boards and commissions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Boards And Commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB628 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27