HI SB622 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides tuition waivers for children of military personnel disabled, killed in the line of duty, or declared prisoners of war or missing in action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UH Tuition Waivers; Dependents of Veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-02-17 (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2009-02-17 (S) The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
2009-02-12 (S) The committee(s) on PSM/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:30 PM in conference room 229.
2009-01-28 (S) Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM.
2009-01-26 (S) Passed First Reading.
2009-01-23 (S) Introduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB452 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback