HI SB616 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB616
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the exemption from the behavior analyst licensing requirements permanent for certain teachers working in collaboration with a licensed behavior analyst or licensed psychologist. Clarifies that the licensure exemption for registered behavior technicians applies to those working under the direction of a licensed behavior analyst or licensed psychologist. Exempts licensed special education teachers and individuals in approved and accredited special education training programs who are working toward licensure as special education teachers whose scope of practice and training includes applied behavior analysis.
Title
Relating To The Practice Of Behavior Analysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/EDU, CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB616 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to HTH/EDU, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=616&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB616_.HTM |