HI SB610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a public member of any board or commission under DCCA's purview from being engaged in the occupation that the board or commission regulates; being associated with a member of the occupation that the board or commission regulates that results in a material conflict of interest, an appearance of impropriety, or a reasonable suspicion that the public member does not represent the public interest; or having a financial interest in the regulated occupation. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Boards And Commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-21 at 10:00AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-12-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-10 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-10-21 at 11:30AM. |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB610 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).