HI SB604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement that a disabled veteran be in receipt of disability retirement pay in order to be exempt from the payment of annual vehicle registration fees.
Title
Relating To Exemptions From Registration Fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.