HI SB604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the lapse date for the mitigating of hazardous situations appropriation from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2019.
Title
Relating To The Mitigation Of Hazardous Situations Statewide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB144 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 121, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
HB144 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 121, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=604&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB604_.HTM |