HI SB604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii public housing authority to review the redevelopment project at Kuhio park terrace; requires report to the legislature no later than September 30, 2011.
Title
Kuhio Park Terrace; Redevelopment Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-16-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=604 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB604_.HTM |