HI SB601 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for an electronic-based curriculum tools pilot program for one public intermediate or middle school to be selected by the department of education. (SD1)
Title
Department of Education; Electronic-based Curriculum Tools Pilot Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Taniguchi. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |