HI SB6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to establish and collect a new residential development fee from developers for certain new residential development projects and establishes the homelessness and affordable housing special fund for the purposes of building, renting, and rehabilitating housing to be used as housing for the homeless.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-17 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=6&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB6_.HTM |